MD SB129 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB33
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain prohibition on prosecuting a person for rape or a certain sexual offense against a victim who was the person's legal spouse at the time of the alleged rape or sexual offense.
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {283326/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2022-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
SB33 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Crutchfield and Bartlett)
SB33 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Crutchfield and Bartlett)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |