MD SB33 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB129
Note: Carry Over of previous SB250
Note: Carry Over of previous SB250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Crutchfield and Bartlett)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Crutchfield and Bartlett)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "sexual contact"; and repealing a certain prohibition on prosecuting a person for rape or a certain sexual offense against a victim who was the person's legal spouse at the time of the alleged rape or sexual offense.
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Fourth-Degree Sexual Offense and Spousal Defense
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Crutchfield and Bartlett) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Crutchfield and Bartlett) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and West) |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and West) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Consents Return |
2022-04-09 | House | House Consents Return |
2022-04-09 | House | Senate Requests Return |
2022-04-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and Sydnor) |
2022-04-09 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2022-04-09 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests Return |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and Sydnor) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-9) |
2022-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {423322/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-04-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {623121/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB33 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Crutchfield and Bartlett)
HB153 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
SB250 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan)
HB153 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
SB250 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |