MD SB250 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB33
Note: Carry Over of previous SB230
Note: Carry Over of previous SB230
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "sexual contact"; and repealing a certain prohibition on prosecuting a person for rape or a certain sexual offense against a victim who was the person's legal spouse at the time of the alleged rape or sexual offense.
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Fourth Degree Sexual Offense and Spousal Defense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2021-04-10 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan) |
2021-04-10 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2021-04-10 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Hough) |
2021-04-10 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-10 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Hough) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-18) |
2021-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {133823/1 Adopted |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {348373/1 Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB250 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan)
HB147 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB230 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
HB147 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB230 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |