MD HB4 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB153
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain prohibition on prosecuting a person for rape or a certain sexual offense against a victim who was the person's legal spouse at the time of the alleged rape or sexual offense.
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2022-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB153 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
SB129 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
SB129 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |