MD SB1108 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "compounding" for purposes of provisions of law governing sterile compounding to exclude mixing, reconstituting, or similar acts routinely performed by or under the supervision of an oncologist, a rheumatologist, or hematologist who administers chemotherapy, biologic therapy, supportive care medication, rheumatology therapy, or any other therapy in the treatment of cancer, a rheumatology condition, or a blood condition and in accordance with specified directions and guidance; etc.
Title
Sterile Compounding Permits - Definition of "Compounding", Study, and Recommendations
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {866788/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {983720/1 Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {744033/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Drugs
Fees
Health Occupations
Inspections
Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Reports
Discipline
Drugs
Fees
Health Occupations
Inspections
Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Reports