MD SB1099 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 to add an additional grantee to specified grants.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |