MD SB1044 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to report to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015, on the status of the Commission's efforts to provide appropriate protections for consumers in connection with competitive retail electricity supply and retail gas supply and recommendations regarding ratepayer protections; specifying the contents of the report; requiring the Commission to convene a workgroup of interested persons, including retail electricity suppliers, to advise the Commission; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission - Competitive Retail Electricity and Gas Supply - Consumer Protection - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2014-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {513490/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {447876/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Licenses
Public Service Commission
Reports
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Licenses
Public Service Commission
Reports
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation