MD HB938 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Real Property Transfer-on-Death Deed Task Force to study other jurisdictions that have implemented the use of a transfer-on-death deed for real property; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the implementation of a transfer-on-death deed in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB698 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-20 - Referred Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback