MD HB935 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide reimbursement for certain behavioral health peer recovery, measurement-based care, and crisis response services; requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage and reimbursement for certain behavioral health services; etc.
Title
Health and Health Insurance - Behavioral Health Services - Expansion (Behavioral Health System Modernization Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB637 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Governor
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Budgets
Governor
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 141.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 857 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0935?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0935f.pdf |