MD HB815 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the application of provisions of law relating to collective bargaining to specified Maryland Transportation Authority police officers; providing that the provisions of law do not apply to Maryland Transportation Authority police officers who are supervisory, managerial, or confidential employees, as defined in specified regulations; requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority Police officers to have a separate bargaining unit; etc.
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority Police Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Galen Clagett [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] |
Del. Steven DeBoy [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Adrienne Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Brinkley) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Brinkley) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Motion Special Order 4/12 (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (15-30) | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Special Order later today (Senator Brinkley) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (111-29) | |
2010-04-07 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (107-31) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (36-104) | |
2010-03-23 | Special Order next session (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2010-03-01 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aircraft
Airports
Annotated Code of Maryland
Arbitration
Citations
Collective Bargaining
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Parking
Petitions
Ports
Reports
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
State Employees
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Aircraft
Airports
Annotated Code of Maryland
Arbitration
Citations
Collective Bargaining
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Parking
Petitions
Ports
Reports
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
State Employees
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment