MD HB766 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing collective bargaining rights for community college employees; establishing procedures for the selection of an exclusive bargaining representative; establishing that a maximum number of six bargaining units may be designated at each community college; requiring certain contracts and agreements entered into before October 1, 2019, to remain in effect until the agreement or contract expires; etc.
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Arbitration
Ballots
Budgets
Certifications
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Contracts
Counties
Discrimination
Education
Elections
Evidence
Fees
Gifts
Harassment
Hearings
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Local Government Mandates
Mediation
Nonprofit Organizations
Oaths
Petitions
Public Employees
Public Information
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Strikes
Threats
Time
Violence
Witnesses
Arbitration
Ballots
Budgets
Certifications
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Contracts
Counties
Discrimination
Education
Elections
Evidence
Fees
Gifts
Harassment
Hearings
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Local Government Mandates
Mediation
Nonprofit Organizations
Oaths
Petitions
Public Employees
Public Information
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Strikes
Threats
Time
Violence
Witnesses