MD HB738 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $50,000 to $500,000 the amount of general liability insurance that an applicant for a home improvement contractor license or a licensed home improvement contractor must maintain.
Title
Business Regulation - Licensed Home Improvement Contractors - Liability Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530 |
2024-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-25) |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB806 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Subjects
Building Maintenance and Repair
Business Regulation
Commerce and Business
Contractors
Home Improvement
Insurance
Liability
Licenses
Business Regulation
Commerce and Business
Contractors
Home Improvement
Insurance
Liability
Licenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 8 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 8 | 302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |