MD HB723 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program to be the Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers; requiring that Maryland Correctional Enterprises provide the proposed prevailing average market price of certain goods and services that are available from Maryland Correctional Enterprises to the Pricing and Selection Committee; etc.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Griffith) Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Griffith) Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {633322/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713323/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB461 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Subjects
Blind Persons
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment