MD HB719 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB229
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, subject to a certain limitation, to release certain personal information of a minor who is at least 16 years old and has a work permit to employers and apprenticeship sponsors, educational programs and institutions, and local workforce development boards that have requested and have registered with the Department for the purpose of receiving the information.
Title
Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-29) |
2022-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663229/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB719 (Carry Over) 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules
SB420 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
SB420 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Apprentices
Committees and Commissions
Education
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Department of
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Education
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Department of
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |