MD HB229 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB719
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to release certain personal information of a minor who has a work permit to employers and apprenticeship sponsors, educational programs and institutions, and local workforce development boards that have requested and have registered with the Maryland Department of Labor for the purpose of receiving the information, if a parent or legal guardian of the minor or the minor elects to allow the sharing of the information.
Title
Employment for Minors - Opportunities for Work
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-21) |
2023-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-01 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB172 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
HB719 (Carry Over) 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules
HB719 (Carry Over) 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Age
Apprentices
Education
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Department of
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Apprentices
Education
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Department of
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |