MD HB673 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Health to authorize an employee of a State facility to work according to an "alternative workweek", which means a work schedule under which a certain employee may work less than 40 hours in a week; requiring that a certain employee be considered a full-time employee of the State; providing that certain provisions of law governing the payment for overtime work do not apply to employees of a State facility who are authorized to work according to a certain alternative workweek; etc.
Title
State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2021-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {186085/1 Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB542 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Subjects
Emergency Bills
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Laws and Ordinances
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Laws and Ordinances
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 2 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 8 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |