MD HB624 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an electric company to contract for renewable energy credits and electricity generated from certain Tier 1 renewable sources to meet a portion of the renewable energy portfolio standard for the electric company starting in 2023; authorizing an electric company to receive annual remuneration for contracts; authorizing an electric company to account for the purchase of contracts as a regulatory asset, but prohibiting the collection of an additional return on the regulatory asset; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Electricity - Standard Offer Service - Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB334 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Subjects
Contracts
Energy
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Solar Energy
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Energy
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Solar Energy
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |