MD SB334 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Long-Term Power Purchase Agreements for Renewable Energy Workgroup to review certain long-term contracts and power purchase agreements for renewable energy, study the feasibility of implementing long-term power purchase agreements for renewable energy contracts in the State, and report its findings and recommendations by December 1, 2022; requiring a certain certification agency in consultation with other entities in the State to initiate a certain study on the renewable energy industry; etc.
Title
Long-Term Power Purchase Agreements for Renewable Energy Workgroup and Minority-Owned and Women-Owned Businesses Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543522/1 Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB624 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Solar Energy
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Energy
Energy Matters
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Solar Energy
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |