MD HB61 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a single registration plate to all classes of vehicles; providing for the method of attachment of the registration plate; and requiring the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland to make specified corrections.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Legislative Services, Department of
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Legislative Services, Department of
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration