MD HB558 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which specified depository institutions may conduct a savings promotion raffle; repealing a requirement that a depository institution that offers a savings promotion raffle must post in specified locations and disclose in specified materials a specified statement describing the terms and conditions of the raffle; repealing a requirement that the Commissioner of Financial Regulation must approve a savings promotion raffle conducted by a banking institution; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95 |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Credit Unions
Disclosure
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Insurance
Notices
Raffles
Credit Unions
Disclosure
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Insurance
Notices
Raffles