MD HB47 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1164
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to, by December 1, 2022, develop content standards for expanded American history; requiring each county board of education, in collaboration with the local school system, to develop and implement certain curriculum guides for expanded American history; requiring each public school, by the 2023-2024 school year, to include expanded American history in the social studies curriculum; and requiring the State Department of Education and the State Board to jointly analyze certain content standards.
Title
Public Schools – Expanded American History – Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-10-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB47 (Carry Over) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
SB462 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
SB462 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Historical Matters
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Women
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Historical Matters
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Women
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0047?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0047f.pdf |