MD HB449 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain designations on a marriage license and certificate; and authorizing the clerk of the circuit court to maintain a certain electronic record as an alternative to the requirement that the clerk keep a certain marriage license book.
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Floor Amendment 213225/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 93 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Floor Amendment 213225/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 93 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 372 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-27) |
2021-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | Floor Amendment {213225/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-93) |
2021-03-02 | House | Floor Amendment {243523/1 (Delegate Parrott) Withdrawn |
2021-02-26 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Parrott) Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB488 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 2 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 2 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |