MD HB411 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2020, a person from selling, offering for sale, or applying to certain surfaces coal tar or coal tar pavement products; and establishing a civil penalty not to exceed $500 for a first offense and not exceeding $1,000 for a second or subsequent offense for certain violations.
Title
Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar and Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Coal
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Highways
Industry and Technology
Local Government Mandates
Penalties and Sentences
Retail Sales
Coal
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Highways
Industry and Technology
Local Government Mandates
Penalties and Sentences
Retail Sales