MD HB41 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB952
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing, altering, and clarifying penalties for and elements of certain firearm-related crimes; prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a certain defendant charged with a certain firearm-related crime under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Crimes – Firearms – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2023-08-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB952 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Dealers
District Courts
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Ex-Offenders
Guns
Identification
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Repeat Offenders
Theft
Transfer of Goods
Violence
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Dealers
District Courts
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Ex-Offenders
Guns
Identification
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Repeat Offenders
Theft
Transfer of Goods
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 5 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 7 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 6 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 141 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 142 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 144 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |