MD HB400 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to grant a preference in hiring and promotion to eligible veterans, spouses of eligible veterans who have service-connected disabilities, and surviving spouses of deceased eligible veterans; and defining the term "eligible veteran" as any veteran of any branch of the armed forces of the United States who has an honorable discharge or a certificate of satisfactory completion of military service.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses PG/MC 106-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Bi-County Agencies
Disabilities
Spouses
Veterans
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor, and Employment
Bi-County Agencies
Disabilities
Spouses
Veterans
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 18 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |