MD HB255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging each county board of education to implement an agricultural education program that prepares students for successful careers and informed choices relating to certain systems and for opportunities in agriculture-related employment and higher education by providing instruction and developing skills in certain areas through certain integrated classroom and laboratory instruction, supervised agricultural experiences, and leadership experiences and involvement in student organizations.
Title
Public Schools - Agricultural Education Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {305867/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Agriculture
Apprentices
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Food
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Laboratories
Natural Resources
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Work, Labor and Employment
Apprentices
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Food
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Laboratories
Natural Resources
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Work, Labor and Employment