MD HB242 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB83
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the jurisdiction of the equity court to include a petition for emancipation of a minor and authorization to marry; altering the conditions under which an individual who is 17 years old is authorized to marry; prohibiting an individual under the age of 17 years from marrying; requiring a clerk of the court to review a certain order before issuing a marriage license; authorizing a court to deny an emancipation petition and marriage authorization if the court makes a written finding it is not in the petitioner's best interest; etc.
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-38) |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {892819/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-09 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB242 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB173 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
SB173 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Attorneys
Clerks of Court
Court of Appeals
Court Orders
Courts
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Marriage
Minors
Petitions
Pregnancy
Protection Orders
Records
Rules and Regulations
Clerks of Court
Court of Appeals
Court Orders
Courts
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Marriage
Minors
Petitions
Pregnancy
Protection Orders
Records
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 2 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |