MD HB83 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB242

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jan 27 @ 1:00 pm House Judiciary Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a minor to file a petition for emancipation of a minor and authorization to marry in the minor's own name in the Circuit Court for the county in which the minor resides; extending the jurisdiction of the equity court to include a petition for emancipation of a minor and authorization to marry; authorizing an individual who is 17 years old to marry under certain circumstances; requiring an applicant for a marriage license to provide a certain document to a clerk of the court; prohibiting a person under the age of 17 from marrying; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law – Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-07HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2021-07-23HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB242 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB29 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law1201(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2301(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2402(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2405(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A5(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback