MD SB173 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the jurisdiction of the equity court to include a petition for emancipation of a minor and authorization to marry; altering the conditions under which an individual who is 17 years old is authorized to marry; prohibiting an individual under the age of 17 years from marrying; requiring an applicant for a marriage license to provide a certain document to a clerk of the court; requiring a clerk of the court to review a certain order before issuing a marriage license under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB242 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-19 - Referred Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law1201(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2301(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2402(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2405(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A5(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback