MD HB198 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from the inheritance tax for real property subject to a certain perpetual conservation easement that passes from a decedent to a niece or nephew of the decedent; requiring the recapture of certain inheritance tax under certain circumstances; and applying the Act to decedents dying after December 31, 2017.
Title
Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption
Sponsors
Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. Kathy Afzali [R] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Ned Carey [D] |
Del. Sally Jameson [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. April Rose [R] |
Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |