MD HB167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial to study establishing a memorial dedicated to Maryland women veterans; and requiring the Commission to submit a preliminary report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by February 1, 2023, and a final report by September 30, 2023.
Title
Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423 |
2022-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {513021/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-10-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Investigations and Inquiries
Monuments and Memorials
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Investigations and Inquiries
Monuments and Memorials
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment