MD HB1642 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to designate an individual as the Student Loan Ombudsman to serve as a liaison between student loan borrowers and student loan servicers; establishing the duties and responsibilities of the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the Ombudsman, in consultation with the Commissioner, to establish a certain student loan borrower education course with certain requirements; etc.
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {257371/1 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703794/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Criminal Background Investigations
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Disclosure
Education
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Higher Education
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Loans
Notices
Ombudsmen
Postal Service
Records
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Criminal Background Investigations
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Disclosure
Education
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Higher Education
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Loans
Notices
Ombudsmen
Postal Service
Records
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students