MD HB1642 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to designate an individual as the Student Loan Ombudsman to serve as a liaison between student loan borrowers and student loan servicers; establishing the duties and responsibilities of the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the Ombudsman, in consultation with the Commissioner, to establish a certain student loan borrower education course with certain requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateRecommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {257371/1
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {703794/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback