MD HB1494 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an agreement to accept payment for the premium charged for a bail bond in installments to be in a form approved by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; prohibiting the agreement from including a confessed judgment clause that waives a consumer's right to assert a specified defense; prohibiting a bail bondsman from including a specified confessed judgment clause that waives a consumer's right to assert a specified defense in an agreement to accept payment for the premium charged for a bail bond in installments; etc.
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {782610/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {782610/1 |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters |