MD HB1470 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Apprenticeship and Training Council, on or before October 1, 2018, to adopt regulations establishing a ratio of journeyworkers to apprentices employed in the electrical craft or trade; prohibiting the Council from establishing a ratio less than a specified amount; requiring an employer in the electrical craft or trade to comply with specified regulations; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to investigate a specified suspected violation under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apprentices
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Electricians
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Electricians
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment