MD HB1364 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission to plan and conduct observances in 2034 commemorating the 400th anniversary of Maryland's founding; requiring the membership of the Commission to reflect the diversity of the State to the extent practicable; requiring the Commission to meet at least twice a year; requiring the Commission to provide an update to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2022, and each year thereafter on the plan of action for the commemoration; etc.
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {873026/1 Adopted |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 9:30 a.m. |
2021-03-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB946 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Subjects
Advertising
Archives
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Curriculum
Demographics
Education
Ethnic Affairs
General Assembly
Governor
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
meetings
Motion Pictures
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Planning, Department of
Public Officials
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Special Events
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Time
Tourism
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Archives
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Curriculum
Demographics
Education
Ethnic Affairs
General Assembly
Governor
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
meetings
Motion Pictures
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Planning, Department of
Public Officials
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Special Events
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Time
Tourism
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |