MD SB946 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission to plan and conduct observances commemorating the 400th year of Maryland's founding in 2034; requiring the membership of the Commission to reflect the diversity of the State to the extent practical; requiring the Commission to meet at least twice a year; requiring the Commission to provide an update to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2022, and each year thereafter on the plan of action for the commemoration; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2021-04-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {353128/1 Adopted
2021-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-03-24HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-22SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
2021-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {384338/1 Adopted
2021-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-10SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-02SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1364 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government93301(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93302(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93303(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93304(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93305(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93306(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93307(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback