MD HB1308 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the notice requirements for an applicant for a new alcoholic beverages license or changes to an existing license in Howard County; requiring the Howard County Board of License Commissioners to publish a certain hearing notice on the Board's website for at least 15 days before the hearing on an application; requiring the Board to provide a notice of a hearing on an application to the Howard County Office of Public Information; and requiring the Office of Public Information to post the hearing notice in the same manner as other meeting notices.
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 773 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {653322/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Howard County
Notices
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Howard County
Notices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 23 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 23 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 23 | 1505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |