MD HB1291 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $1,500,000 to $2,000,000 the amount that the State Comptroller is required to distribute of specified abandoned property funds each year to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund.
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-48) (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-48) |
2017-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {744861/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Comptroller
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legal Aid
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Comptroller
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legal Aid
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes