MD HB1211 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating commercial financing transactions, including by establishing requirements related to disclosures, calculations of annual percentage rates, terms of repayments, and other related items, and the extension of special offers; making a violation of the Act an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and subject to certain enforcement and penalty provisions; etc.
Title
Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Disclosure
Ethics
Fees
Finance Companies
Financial Institutions
Investigations and Inquiries
Loans
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Weights and Measures
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Disclosure
Ethics
Fees
Finance Companies
Financial Institutions
Investigations and Inquiries
Loans
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 11 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |