MD SB825 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain revenue, fees, and examination and investigation fees and assessments relating to commercial financing transactions be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund; regulating commercial financing transactions, including by establishing requirements related to disclosures, calculations of annual percentage rates, terms of repayments, and other related items, and the extension of special offers; etc.
Title
Commercial Financing Transactions - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {103929/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {103929/1 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Carry Over) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1211 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1211 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Disclosure
Ethics
Fees
Finance Companies
Financial Institutions
Forms
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Loans
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Time
Weights and Measures
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Disclosure
Ethics
Fees
Finance Companies
Financial Institutions
Forms
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Loans
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 1115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |