MD HB1196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of the authority of a county or municipal corporation to withhold from tax sale owner-occupied residential property and requiring the property to meet certain criteria; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to withhold from tax sale a residential property or property owned by a nonprofit organization that is enrolled in a certain payment program; and authorizing a county or municipal corporation to cancel or postpone a tax sale during a state of emergency.
Title
Tax Sales - Alternative Collection Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {323828/1 Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {533224/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Debt Management
Emergencies
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Residential Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Debt Management
Emergencies
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Residential Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |