MD HB1186 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to determine the amount and duration of a certain tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the dwelling of certain elderly individuals and veterans; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans Tax Credit - Amount and Duration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267 |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2022-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {343220/1 Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {973624/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Assessments
Baltimore City
Counties
Elderly Persons
Property Tax
Residential Property
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Assessments
Baltimore City
Counties
Elderly Persons
Property Tax
Residential Property
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 258 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |