MD HB1171 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before July 1 each year, an electric company to submit an electrical service restoration plan to the Public Service Commission for a specified purpose; requiring the plan to address specified matters; requiring the Commission to review the plan and take specified actions; requiring, on or before a December 1 each year, the Commission to issue final approval of the plan; and requiring the Commission to use all powers and authority to enforce the Act.
Title
Electric Companies - Electrical Service Restoration Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1171.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1171f.pdf |