MD HB1166 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State Police, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to annually publish, beginning on October 1, 2024, a handbook summarizing State laws that apply to the wearing, carrying, and transporting of a handgun in public; requiring the Secretary to draft the handbook in plain language that can be easily understood without any special knowledge of the laws of the State; and requiring the Secretary to make copies of the handbook available to members of the public in a certain manner.
Title
Handguns - Wear, Carry, and Transport Laws - Handbook Publication
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB501 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-01 - Referred Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1166?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb1166f.pdf |