MD HB1163 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB820
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1297
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1376
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1297
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1376
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a teacher preparation program to include certain training related to teaching in a virtual learning environment as a component of instruction; providing that a county board of education may authorize a county superintendent of schools to provide virtual education to students instead of closing the public schools because of severe weather conditions; requiring the Department, by September 1, 2022, to establish a statewide universal learning management system for all public schools in the State; etc.
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-41) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-13) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {713221/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-40) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {883223/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-17 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1163 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB1163 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB1376 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Referred Rules
HB1163 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB1376 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
COVID-19
Curriculum
Cybersecurity
Data
Demographics
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Ethnic Affairs
Food
Foster Care
Gender
Governor
Grants
Health
Immigrants and Citizenship
Indigent Persons
Industry and Technology
internet
Internet Access
Job Training
Language
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Mentors
Minorities
Minors
pandemics
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Recordings
Remote and Hybrid Education
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Special Education
Sports and Recreation
State Aid
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Truancy
Virtual Environments
Volunteers
Weather
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
COVID-19
Curriculum
Cybersecurity
Data
Demographics
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Ethnic Affairs
Food
Foster Care
Gender
Governor
Grants
Health
Immigrants and Citizenship
Indigent Persons
Industry and Technology
internet
Internet Access
Job Training
Language
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Mentors
Minorities
Minors
pandemics
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Recordings
Remote and Hybrid Education
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Special Education
Sports and Recreation
State Aid
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Truancy
Virtual Environments
Volunteers
Weather
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 6 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 103.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1401.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7-14A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |