MD HB1155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to adopt an ordinance to prohibit disposing of a bulky item on a highway or on public or private property except under certain circumstances; authorizing Prince George's County to impose certain penalties; defining "bulky item" as any discarded furniture, home or industrial appliance, or abandoned vehicle or a part of a vehicle; etc.
Title
Prince George’s County – Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items – Penalties PG 418–19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-04-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {610818/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drivers' Licenses
Fines
Hearings
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Litter
Motor Vehicle Administration
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Real Property
Repeate Offenders
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drivers' Licenses
Fines
Hearings
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Litter
Motor Vehicle Administration
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Real Property
Repeate Offenders
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration