MD HB1155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding table games to a specified definition of proceeds that applies to video lottery terminal operations.
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Table Game Proceeds
Sponsors
Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Sheila Hixson [D] | Del. Eric Luedtke [D] |
Del. Leroy Myers [R] | Del. Frank Turner [D] | Del. Jay Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-26) (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-35) (Y: 97 N: 35 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-35) (Y: 97 N: 35 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578 |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-26) |
2013-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {599236/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-35) |
2013-03-14 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |