MD HB1073 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified health maintenance organization contracts, health insurance policies, and policies of nonprofit health service plans from containing a provision requiring personal injury protection benefits to be paid before benefits under the policies and contracts.
Title
Insurance - Coordination of Benefits - Health Insurance and Personal Injury
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. John Donoghue [D] |
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Joseph Vallario [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (131-6) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |