MD HB1047 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an appeal authority that makes a decision on a property tax appeal that is adverse to a taxpayer to provide the taxpayer with a written statement that specifically states the rationale for the decision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Appeals – Adverse Decision – Rationale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-26HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback